THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 20:22:48 PM
Reichman, Trevor William
CPSO#:
90474
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Mar 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
11 Jan 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Univ of Med & Dentistry of New Jersey, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
11-PMB-172
585 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 5404
Fax: (416) 340-4039
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Trevor Reichman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 14 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:11 Jan 2019 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Jan 2019 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 09 Mar 2021 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Mar 2021 |
|
Active |