THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:48:27 AM
Newman, David Jonathan
CPSO#:
90464
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
6119 Us Highway 11 Ste 11
St. Lawrence Health Medical Campus
Orthopedics
Main level
Canton NY 13617-3992
United States
Phone: (315) 261-5850
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID JONATHAN NEWMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEWMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
AVP - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |