THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 3:47:58 AM
Mohammed, Safraz
CPSO#:
90454
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jul 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Unit C2214
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 19607
Fax: 613-761-4249
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAFRAZ MOHAMMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMMED is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
AVP - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2015 |