THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 9:41:25 AM
Kelley, Melissa Dawn
CPSO#:
90431
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Oct 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Oct 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock St
Kingston ON K7L 5G2
Phone: 613-544-3400
Electoral District: 06
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Upper Canada Lower Bowel Clinic
1366 Yonge Street
Toronto, ON M4T 3A7
Date Received: 29 Jul 2015
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:29 Oct 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MELISSA DAWN KELLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELLEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jun 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
EL - Gastroenterology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Mar 2010 to 09 Apr 2010
EL - Gastroenterology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Mar 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Apr 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 May 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 23 Jul 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Oct 2018 |