THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 22:53:00 PM
Radwi, Mansoor Rashidhaider K
CPSO#:
90421
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
10 Aug 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
04 Nov 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, Urdu
Education: King Abdul Aziz University, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saudi Arabia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:30 Oct 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 May 2009 to 26 Jun 2009
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 27 Jun 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Hematology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Hematology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Mar 2017
CF - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 13 May 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Nov 2015 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 10 Aug 2017 |