THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 20:18:24 PM
Vicus, Danielle Lyn
CPSO#:
90400
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Nov 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
04 Nov 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew
Education: Ben-Gurion University of the Negev Facul, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Gynecologic Oncology
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4378
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:01 Aug 2019 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 27 Apr 2009 to 19 Jun 2009
PEAP - CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 20 Jun 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Gynecologic Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
CF - Gynecologic Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 28 Apr 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Nov 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Nov 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Aug 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Oct 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Aug 2019 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Aug 2019 |
|
Active |