THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 5:00:43 AM
MacKenzie-Feder, Jessica Mariam
CPSO#:
90391
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
19 Dec 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Nov 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:24 Sep 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 04 May 2009 to 28 May 2009
EL - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Ottawa, 22 Nov 2011 to 19 Dec 2011
EL - Endocrinology and Metabolism
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 May 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 May 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Nov 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Dec 2011 |