THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 17:14:03 PM
Mylonas, Ilias
CPSO#:
90386
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Jul 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:16 Sep 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 05 May 2009 to 01 Jun 2009
EL - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 09 Mar 2010 to 05 Apr 2010
EL - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 12 Jul 2010 to 31 Jul 2010
EL - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 May 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Mar 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Apr 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jul 2012 |