THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 0:09:04 AM
Kapalanga, Nyolima Joachim Bill
CPSO#:
90364
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Apr 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
16 Apr 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Acholi, English, Lingala, Other, Swahili
Education: University of Dar Es Salaam, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Grey Bruce Health Services
Department of Paediatrics
Suite 8226
8-2 1800 8th St E
Owen Sound ON N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121 Ext. 2854
Fax: (519) 378-1583
Electoral District: 03
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Prince Edward Island
USA - Connecticut
USA - Missouri
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cambridge Memorial Hospital |
Cambridge |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound |
Owen Sound |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:16 Apr 2009 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Apr 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Apr 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Jul 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Dec 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Jun 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Jan 2012 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Nov 2012 |
|
Active |