THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 18:47:02 PM
Linkletter, Martha Lynn
CPSO#:
90351
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
16 Andrew Street
Kitchener ON N2H 5R2
Phone: (519) 804-9234
Fax: (519) 804-9785
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:25 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARTHA LYNN LINKLETTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINKLETTER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Apr 2009 to 01 May 2009
EL - Adolescent Medicine
McMaster University, 19 Nov 2012 to 14 Dec 2012
EL - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Apr 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 May 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Nov 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Dec 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2013 |