THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 3:15:48 AM
Teschke, Susan Reilly
CPSO#:
90342
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
700 Main Street East
Hamilton ON L8M 1K7
Phone: 2896395532
Fax: (905) 545-6793
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:26 Sep 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:24 Sep 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUSAN REILLY TESCHKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TESCHKE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 09 Apr 2009 to 06 May 2009
EL - Endocrinology and Metabolism
McMaster University, 24 Oct 2011 to 20 Nov 2011
EL - Endocrinology and Metabolism
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Apr 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 May 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Nov 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jun 2013 |