THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 5:48:46 AM
Ducas, Robin Alexandra
CPSO#:
90339
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
31 Aug 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Manitoba
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:24 Sep 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:02 Oct 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 09 Apr 2009 to 06 May 2009
EL - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 02 Aug 2012 to 22 Aug 2012
EL - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Apr 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 May 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Aug 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Jun 2019 |