THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 8:10:34 AM
Kannu, Peter
CPSO#:
90328
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
24 Aug 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
13 Apr 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Malay
Education: University of Otago, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Mar 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Mar 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Mar 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Mar 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Apr 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 24 Aug 2021 |