THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 17:55:28 PM
Somal, Kirandeep
CPSO#:
90323
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Jul 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
5-330 West St
Brantford ON N3R 7V5
Phone: 5197327703
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KIRANDEEP SOMAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOMAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 08 Apr 2009 to 06 May 2009
EL - Dermatology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Oct 2010 to 31 Oct 2010
EL - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2010 to 30 Nov 2010
EL - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Apr 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 May 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jan 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 2014 |