THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 13:14:21 PM
Azuh, Victor Ijoma
CPSO#:
90322
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Apr 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
06 Apr 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Igbo
Education: University of Lagos, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Dr. Azuh Medicine Professional Corp
Unit 100
4900 Wyandotte St E
Windsor ON N8Y 1H7
Phone: (519) 974-8682
Fax: (519) 974-8836
Electoral District: 01
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Apr 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Apr 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 05 Oct 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Jul 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jan 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Sep 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Sep 2010 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Sep 2010 |
|
Active |