THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 14:52:52 PM
Gulati, Brij Bhushan
CPSO#:
90300
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Jul 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
16 Mar 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Nagpur University, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Brij Bhushan Gulati Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 30 2023
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Georgia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Mar 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Mar 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 15 Sep 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Aug 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2023 |