THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 17:24:05 PM
Al Ghazaly, Samer Ahmed Farghaly
CPSO#:
90286
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jul 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4421
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAMER AHMED FARGHALY AL GHAZALY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL GHAZALY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Mar 2009 to 28 Apr 2009
PEAP - CF - Cardiac Anaesthesia
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 29 Apr 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Cardiac Anaesthesia
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
AVP - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 18 Dec 2015
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 09 Mar 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Apr 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Dec 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Dec 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Jul 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jul 2016 |