THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 8:30:47 AM
Kandasamy, Gengatharan
CPSO#:
90282
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Jun 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
14 Jun 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: Spartan Health Sciences University, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 9
1801 Harwood Avenue North
Ajax ON L1T 0K8
Phone: (905) 426-5050
Fax: (905) 426-5077
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Jun 2012 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 09 Mar 2009 to 31 May 2009
AVP - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jun 2009 to 08 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 09 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 04 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 09 Mar 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Dec 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Jan 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 May 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 May 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 May 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Aug 2017 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Aug 2017 |
|
Active |