THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:13:53 AM
Pinard, Brigitte
CPSO#:
90277
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
20 May 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
03 Mar 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Ottawa, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Public Health and Preventive Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 02 Mar 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 20 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Mar 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 May 2013 |