THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 0:47:58 AM
Al Mutairi, Dakheelallah Mohammed Saeed Abdul Hadi
CPSO#:
90275
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
20 May 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Apr 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Karachi, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 04 Mar 2009 to 31 Mar 2009
PEAP - CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 2010 to 28 Feb 2011
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 2011 to 20 May 2011
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 04 Mar 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 May 2011 |