THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 5:13:39 AM
Tong, Maorong
CPSO#:
90274
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jun 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Japanese, Mandarin
Education: Bengbu Medical College, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Regional Health
Centre
Department of Hospitalists
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Electoral District: 05
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
Tel: 1-888-563-3732
Website: www.recordsolution.ca
Date Received: 02 Nov 2017
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brant Community Healthcare System |
Brantford |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Mar 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MAORONG TONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TONG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 09 Mar 2009 to 31 May 2009
AVP - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jun 2009 to 07 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 08 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 09 Mar 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 2011 |