THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:40:46 AM
Zaidi, Mukarram Ali
CPSO#:
90273
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
22 Jan 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
04 Nov 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: Dow Medical College, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Mukarram Ali Zaidi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 17 2013
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 09 Mar 2009 to 31 May 2009
AVP - Community Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jun 2009 to 07 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 08 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 29 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 30 Aug 2010 to 28 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 29 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 09 Mar 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Nov 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Nov 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Jan 2013 |