THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 19:49:51 PM
Pellizzari, Michael Paul
CPSO#:
90270
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Mar 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Mar 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Woodstock General Hospital
310 Juliana Dr
Woodstock ON N4V 0A4
Phone: (519) 430-3087
Fax: (519) 804-4887
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lake of the Woods District Hospital |
Kenora |
Stratford General Hospital |
Stratford |
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital |
Tillsonburg |
Woodstock Hospital |
Woodstock |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Mar 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL PAUL PELLIZZARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PELLIZZARI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 09 Mar 2009 to 31 May 2009
AVP - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jun 2009 to 07 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 08 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 13 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 09 Mar 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Mar 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Mar 2011 |