THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 10:49:35 AM
Al Lawati, Ali Iqbal Ali
CPSO#:
90261
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
23 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
25 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Sultan Qaboos University College of Medi, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Jul 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:23 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2009 to 01 May 2009
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 02 May 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2013 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jan 2016
CF - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 May 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 23 Jun 2016 |