THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 2:24:13 AM
Dhillon, Karamvir Kaur
CPSO#:
90256
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Mar 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Mar 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of Pune, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
4th Floor
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON L1H 1B8
Phone: (905) 721-6159
Fax: (905) 721-6619
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:29 Jul 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KARAMVIR KAUR DHILLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHILLON is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Feb 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Feb 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 19 Feb 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Aug 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Mar 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Mar 2010 |