THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 6:13:32 AM
Blaine, William Christopher
CPSO#:
90251
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Mar 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Mar 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan Street South
Renfrew ON K7V 1P6
Phone: (613) 432-4851
Fax: (613) 432-8649
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Renfrew Victoria Hospital |
Renfrew |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Feb 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WILLIAM CHRISTOPHER BLAINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLAINE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Mar 2009 to 24 May 2009
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 May 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Mar 2010 to 01 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 May 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Mar 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Mar 2011 |