THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 22:25:51 PM
Peterson, Carly Elizabeth
CPSO#:
90249
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
13 Aug 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
13 Sep 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Japanese
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 02 Mar 2009 to 29 Mar 2009
EL - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Mar 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Mar 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 13 Aug 2014 |