THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 22:23:20 PM
O'Leary, James Daniel
CPSO#:
90213
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
10 Apr 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Aug 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: James O'Leary Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 18 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Date Received: 11 Apr 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2009 to 08 Apr 2009
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 09 Apr 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Apr 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Oct 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Jun 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Apr 2019 |