THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 4:40:06 AM
Mick, Paul Thomas
CPSO#:
90207
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 Jul 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 Mar 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
British Columbia
Saskatchewan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2009 to 27 Feb 2009
EL - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Feb 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Mar 2019 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Jul 2019 |