THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 4:27:54 AM
Sommerfreund, Rafi David
CPSO#:
90205
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Aug 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Aug 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical Sch, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: (519) 685-8225
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:09 Oct 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAFI DAVID SOMMERFREUND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOMMERFREUND is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Feb 2009 to 26 Apr 2009
AVP - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 27 Apr 2009 to 21 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Sep 2009 to 21 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Sep 2010 to 21 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 09 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 10 Oct 2012 to 09 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Apr 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Jul 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Oct 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 2014 |