THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 13:34:16 PM
Vosoughi, Reza
CPSO#:
90201
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Sep 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Sep 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Persian
Education: Mashhad University of Medical Science, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
30 Bond St
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5377
Fax: (416) 864-5378
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Manitoba
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:24 May 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. REZA VOSOUGHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOSOUGHI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 02 Feb 2009 to 24 Apr 2009
PEAP - CF - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 25 Apr 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 02 Feb 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Apr 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Apr 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Sep 2013 |