THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 0:01:52 AM
Sharma, Manas
CPSO#:
90146
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Apr 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Apr 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Nepali, Other
Education: Gauhati University, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
L H S C University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd
PO Box 5339 Station B
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3203
Fax: (519) 663-8803
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Lee Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 20 2017
Corporation Name: Manas Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 29 2023
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance |
Chatham |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:08 Jan 2021 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 13 Feb 2009
PEAP - CF - Neuroradiology
University of Toronto, 14 Feb 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Neuroradiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Neuroradiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Neuroradiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
CF - Neuroradiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 03 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Neuroradiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 29 Mar 2013
CF - Neuroradiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Feb 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Jan 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Mar 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jan 2020 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2020 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Jan 2021 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Jan 2021 |
|
Active |