THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 10:48:32 AM
Reed, David Edward
CPSO#:
90133
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Oct 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
GI Division
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 2332
Fax: (613) 544-3114
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:04 Oct 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID EDWARD REED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REED is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 02 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jan 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jan 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Apr 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Apr 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Oct 2012 |