THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 16:16:25 PM
van Dyk, Jessie Grace
CPSO#:
90126
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
25 May 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
21 Feb 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Afrikaans, English
Education: University of Pretoria School of Medicin, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
South Africa
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 16 Mar 2009
PEAP - CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 17 Mar 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Aug 2016
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jan 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Mar 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Feb 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Feb 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Dec 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Aug 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Feb 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 25 May 2023 |