THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 14:21:23 PM
Fikry, Alia Mahmoud
CPSO#:
90113
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
31 Mar 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: June 30, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On January 26, 2017, London Health Sciences Centre and St. Joseph’s Health Care, London, (the “hospitals”) notified the College of the termination of Dr. Alia Fikry’s privileges at the hospitals as a result of Dr. Fikry’s dismissal from the paediatrics residency program at Western University’s Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, effective June 30, 2015.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 05 Jan 2009 to 30 Mar 2009
AVP - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 31 Mar 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Dec 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jan 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 Mar 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |