THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:06:29 AM
Talab, Hesham Fathy Ali
CPSO#:
90112
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jan 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa
Department of Anesthesiology TOH
501 Smyth RD
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 71887
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saskatchewan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brockville General Hospital |
Brockville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HESHAM FATHY ALI TALAB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TALAB is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2009 to 02 Feb 2009
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 03 Feb 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Feb 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |