THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 3:13:52 AM
Roy, Debashis
CPSO#:
90110
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jan 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Nov 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English, Hindi, Other, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Silchar Medical College, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anasthesiology
Room M3200, 2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-4864
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:28 Aug 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DEBASHIS ROY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2009 to 06 Feb 2009
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 07 Feb 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2011 to 31 Jan 2012
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
AVP - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 13 Jan 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 14 Jan 2019 to 10 Mar 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 11 Mar 2019 to 07 Apr 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 08 Apr 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Feb 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Dec 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Jan 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Jan 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Nov 2021 |