THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 9:07:37 AM
Lau, Rick Lichi
CPSO#:
90107
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Apr 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Apr 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1-435 King St N
MSK Centre
Waterloo ON N2J 2Z5
Phone: 5196030623 Ext. 2
Fax: 5196030625
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RICK LICHI LAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 06 Jan 2009 to 13 Feb 2009
EL - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Feb 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Apr 2011 |