THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 5:31:12 AM
Kim, Christie Yean
CPSO#:
90100
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jan 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Dec 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph Health Centre
30 Queensway
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000 Ext. 4300
Fax: (416) 530-6472
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: CY Kim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:14 Dec 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:12 Oct 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTIE YEAN KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 15 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
University of Toronto, 16 Jun 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Dec 2009 |