THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 9:01:24 AM
Shuster, Anatoly
CPSO#:
90099
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Aug 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
30 Aug 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew, Russian
Education: Russian State Medical University (RSMU), 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional
Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6431
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Dryden Regional Health Centre |
Dryden |
McCausland Hospital |
Terrace Bay |
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital |
Nipigon |
Sante Manitouwadge Health |
Manitouwadge |
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Wilson Memorial General Hospital |
Marathon |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:01 Jul 2018 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2009 to 21 Feb 2009
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 22 Feb 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Apr 2011
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Feb 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Jul 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Nov 2019 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Nov 2019 |
|
Active |