THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:27:22 AM
Lindholm, James Nirmal Tissa Karunaratne
CPSO#:
90097
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Dublin Trinity College, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 9
460 Renforth Drive
Etobicoke ON M9C 2N2
Phone: (647) 547-8181
Fax: (647) 547-8182
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:29 Jun 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAMES NIRMAL TISSA KARUNARATNE LINDHOLM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINDHOLM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 13 Jan 2009
EL - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 08 May 2009 to 02 Jun 2009
EL - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Jan 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 May 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2009 |