THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 12:43:36 PM
Aul, Ritu Bhavreet
CPSO#:
90089
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Jul 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
NSM Regional Genetics Program
170 Colbourne St. West
Orillia ON L3V 2Z3
Phone: 705-327-9154
Fax: 705-325-9459
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital |
Orillia |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Genetics and Genomics |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RITU BHAVREET AUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 05 Jan 2009 to 30 Jan 2009
EL - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 24 Aug 2009 to 02 Oct 2009
EL - Medical Genetics and Genomics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jan 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jan 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Oct 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 2010 |