THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 7:42:51 AM
Mahmoud, Shireen Farouk Abdel Hakim
CPSO#:
90086
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
6 Harvey St
GOOD DOCTORS MEDICAL Inc.
Chatham ON N7M 1L6
Phone: (888) 930-6571
Fax: (855) 967-2945
Electoral District: 01
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:21 Jun 2016 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHIREEN FAROUK ABDEL HAKIM MAHMOUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHMOUD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 05 Mar 2009
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 06 Mar 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 23 Sep 2014
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Mar 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Mar 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2016 |