THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 4:53:24 AM
Papa, Fabio de Vasconcelos
CPSO#:
90082
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jul 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Sao Paulo, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
116 Boulton Dr
Toronto ON M4V 2V6
Phone: 000-000-0000
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Jul 2022 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 09 Mar 2009
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 10 Mar 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 13 Dec 2011
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 13 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Mar 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Dec 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jul 2020 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2022 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2022 |
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2029 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2022 |
|
Active |