THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 21:22:18 PM
Horner, Robert Joseph
CPSO#:
90068
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
23 Aug 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 Dec 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Horner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 24 2010
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Jan 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:12 Oct 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Dec 2008 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 23 Aug 2011 |