THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 16:42:42 PM
Goswami, Rupashi
CPSO#:
90058
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Feb 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Feb 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Ross University School of Medicine, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
130 HIGHWAY 20 EAST
UNIT A6
Fonthill ON L0S 1E6
Phone: (905) 892-1010
Fax: (905) 892-4004
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: R. Goswami Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 15 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RUPASHI GOSWAMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOSWAMI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Dec 2008 to 23 Feb 2009
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Feb 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 02 Dec 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Feb 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jan 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Feb 2011 |