THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 21:53:05 PM
Goulet, Marie-Helene
CPSO#:
90053
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
27 Jul 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
27 Mar 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:CSCE
738 Rue Notre-Dame
Embrun, ON K0A 1W1
Date Received: 26 Jul 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Jun 2001 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 2008 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Mar 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 27 Jul 2018 |