THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 18:59:03 PM
Singh, Sunita Kaur Shah
CPSO#:
90045
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
585 University Avenue, 11 PMB 176
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-3240
Fax: (647) 689-2738
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:24 Sep 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUNITA KAUR SHAH SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Dec 2008 to 19 Dec 2008
EL - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2009 to 30 Apr 2009
EL - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Dec 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |