THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 17:37:04 PM
Shu, Krishanthy
CPSO#:
90005
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Nov 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Jan 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Sinhalese, Tamil
Education: University of Jaffna, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
King Edward Health Centre
280 King Edward Ave
London ON N5Z 3V3
Phone: (519) 4511363
Fax: 519 451 9395
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KRISHANTHY SHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2008 to 23 Jan 2009
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Jan 2009 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2009 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jan 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jan 2011 |