THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 5:26:42 AM
Ispahany, Mohammad Mehdi
CPSO#:
89964
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Dec 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Dec 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
84 Carden St
Guelph ON N1H 3A3
Phone: (519) 837-0228
Fax: (519) 837-6853
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Lions Head Site |
Lions Head |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound |
Owen Sound |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site |
Chesley |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD MEHDI ISPAHANY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISPAHANY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2008 to 23 Jan 2009
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Jan 2009 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2009 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jan 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Dec 2010 |